Search results
From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
- ...'' was a [[Royal Naval Air Service]] command during the [[Great War]], its officers and men borne in ''Egmont''.375 bytes (55 words) - 19:20, 27 July 2019
- ...tructions were issued to the Director of the [[Air Department (Royal Navy)|Air Department]] at the [[Admiralty]]. ...p Their Lordships fully informed of all details in connection with the Air Service which ought to be brought to their notice.3 KB (465 words) - 18:54, 8 December 2018
- ...mber, 1965) was an officer in the [[Royal Navy]] and the [[Royal Naval Air Service]]. * [http://discovery.nationalarchives.gov.uk/results/r?_q=ADM+196+John+Steel Service Records]1 KB (154 words) - 16:27, 7 April 2022
- ...igh Carslake''', (26 March, 1900 – 21 October, 1926) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. ...ollege, Osborne]] from Rimpton, St. Peter's, Thanet in January, 1916.<ref>"Naval And Military." ''The Times'' (London, England), Monday, Oct 25, 1926; pg.2 KB (344 words) - 22:24, 6 April 2022
- {{Naval Service}} ...ntil amalgamation with the Military Wing of the R.F.C. to form the [[Royal Air Force]], in April, 1918.4 KB (609 words) - 20:02, 30 May 2017
- ...of the [[Naval Wing of the Royal Flying Corps]], or the [[Royal Naval Air Service]] (R.N.A.S.) as it then became. In September, 1915 the position was superseded by the post of [[Director of Air Services]], which temporarily absorbed the executive command of the R.N.A.S3 KB (432 words) - 22:13, 4 February 2022
- '''Howden Air Station''' was a [[Royal Naval Air Service]] command during the [[Great War]]. It opened on 26 June, 1916. The station consisted of barrack huts, officers' quarters, and a pigeon loft for the two carrier pigeons each airship carri1 KB (161 words) - 14:33, 28 March 2022
- ...]] and [[Royal Naval Air Service]] before attaining high rank in the Royal Air Force. He was made a {{LieutRN}} on 30 December, 1907.<ref>Longmore Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/143.}} f. 621.</ref>6 KB (835 words) - 15:35, 7 April 2022
- The '''Boyle Somerville Prize''' was a prize for Royal Naval officers who distinguished themselves in the pursuit of meteorology. It was a cash ...t in connection with the development of meteorology and its application to naval operations. Special consideration will be given to any original papers indi2 KB (285 words) - 19:28, 6 August 2018
- ...29 September, 1901 – 1981) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. One of his Service Records spells his middle name as "Mayrick". ...arslake Prize]] for an essay submitted as a Naval Observer for the [[Fleet Air Arm]].3 KB (391 words) - 22:50, 6 April 2022
- ...ash; ) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. He distinguished himself as an early naval aviator. ...er 1913 through May of 1914, he was a Flying Officer at the [[Grain Island Air Station]].4 KB (647 words) - 22:26, 6 April 2022
- ...with the British Army’s Royal Flying Corps, and the creation of the Royal Air Force in 1918. :1. The defence arrangements for Home Defence against air raids.20 KB (3,445 words) - 20:47, 16 August 2017
- ...ce in history has ever had a tradition so long and glorious as that of the Royal Navy.''</div> ...ble for matériel. The [[Fourth Sea Lord]] (previously known as the Junior Naval Lord) was responsible for supplies. Also on the Board was another politici10 KB (1,512 words) - 13:10, 28 April 2020
- ...drill ship in the West India Docks from 1 April, 1862. In 1872 the Royal Naval Artillery Volunteers were added. On 25 March, 1903 she was renamed ''Old P ...96/15/399.|}} f. 397.</ref>{{NLMar92|p. 245}}|end=8 January, 1893<ref>Hope Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/15/399.|}} f. 397.</ref>}}5 KB (641 words) - 12:57, 4 January 2022
- ...taff''', R.N. (29 December, 1883 – 17 January, 1940) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. Though "slighty deaf", he served ably until problems with alcohol ...8, but this third strike had proven too much. Longstaff was dismissed the service.2 KB (343 words) - 15:35, 7 April 2022
- ...ald Ramsbotham''', O.B.E., R.N. (1 May, 1891 – 1969) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. ...duties.{{NLJan15|p. 356}} This would establish the pattern of his wartime service, in which he served as navigating officer in a number of mostly small ships5 KB (665 words) - 16:08, 7 April 2022
- ...'', D.S.C., R.N. (14 March, 1889 – 14 October, 1940) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. ...04|May 1904 intake term]] at {{UK-1Britannia|f=p}}.{{ToL|Cadetships in the Royal Navy|Thursday, Apr 21, 1904; pg. 12; Issue 37374}}4 KB (683 words) - 16:36, 7 April 2022
- ...Retired (27 February, 1867 – 16 March, 1928) was an officer of the [[Royal Navy]] during the [[First World War]]. ...05, he was appointed in command of the {{UK-Astraea|f=t}}.<ref>Vaughan-Lee Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/42.}} f. 441.</ref>9 KB (1,304 words) - 16:40, 7 April 2022
- Draft naval war manual. October 1938. Lectures given at the Royal Naval Staff College, Greenwich.5 KB (643 words) - 21:49, 8 July 2018
- ...}} '''Clement Moody''', K.C.B. (31 May, 1891 – 1960) served in the [[Royal Navy]]. ...the Retired List at his own request to facilitate the promotion of younger officers on 28 September, 1948. He was promoted to the rank of {{AdmRN}} on the Ret4 KB (548 words) - 15:48, 7 April 2022