Search results
From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
Page title matches
- 370 members (0 subcategories, 0 files) - 21:46, 15 March 2022
- 10 KB (1,038 words) - 00:18, 18 July 2018
- 24 bytes (3 words) - 20:27, 19 June 2014
- 52 bytes (6 words) - 13:41, 24 August 2016
File:Rear-Admiral Arbuthnot.jpg (418 × 600 (25 KB)) - 10:14, 8 January 2010- [[Category:Rear-Admirals (UK)|*]]4 KB (643 words) - 14:13, 8 January 2019
- 322 bytes (40 words) - 14:36, 2 February 2017
File:Rear-Admiral Horace Hood.jpg (2,492 × 3,825 (1.19 MB)) - 20:17, 14 September 2009- 1 KB (217 words) - 14:45, 26 May 2020
File:Gaunt as Rear-Admiral.jpg (282 × 410 (16 KB)) - 08:36, 24 May 2011- 910 bytes (112 words) - 08:53, 3 May 2024
File:Patey as a Rear-Admiral.jpg (459 × 623 (46 KB)) - 10:19, 3 January 2013File:Rear-Admiral Moore (LoC).jpg (738 × 1,024 (118 KB)) - 20:07, 15 October 2010File:Rear-Admiral Wemyss (LoC).jpg (747 × 1,024 (98 KB)) - 21:24, 21 November 2009File:Rear-Admiral Bradford (LoC).jpg (764 × 1,024 (154 KB)) - 21:25, 9 September 2009- ...inery]] were styled '''Engineer Rear-Admiral'''. The new rank ranked with Rear-Admirals,<ref>Order in Council of 28 March, 1903.</ref> so in effect all Chief Inspe885 bytes (114 words) - 17:54, 24 June 2013
File:Rear-Admiral Dyke Acland (LoC).jpg (746 × 1,024 (181 KB)) - 09:29, 25 March 2010- ==Rear-Admirals of the United Kingdom==2 KB (262 words) - 15:36, 7 July 2020
File:Rear-Admiral Cyprian Bridge (LoC).jpg (745 × 1,024 (198 KB)) - 22:37, 16 February 2010- 4 KB (711 words) - 19:50, 18 May 2018
Page text matches
- 278 members (0 subcategories, 0 files) - 14:28, 18 April 2020
- [[Category:Rear-Admirals]] [[Category:Rear-Admirals ({{{1}}})]]271 bytes (27 words) - 00:33, 14 August 2017
- [[Category:Engineer Rear-Admirals]] [[Category:Engineer Rear-Admirals ({{{1}}})]]391 bytes (38 words) - 15:02, 5 April 2020
- ==Rear-Admirals Commanding==1 KB (143 words) - 00:16, 14 September 2022
- ...inery]] were styled '''Engineer Rear-Admiral'''. The new rank ranked with Rear-Admirals,<ref>Order in Council of 28 March, 1903.</ref> so in effect all Chief Inspe885 bytes (114 words) - 17:54, 24 June 2013
- ==Rear-Admirals and Commodores Commanding==2 KB (205 words) - 15:09, 2 April 2024
- ==Rear-Admirals Commanding==2 KB (186 words) - 01:50, 14 September 2022
- ==Rear-Admirals Commanding==2 KB (198 words) - 00:16, 14 September 2022
- 5 KB (792 words) - 16:46, 18 January 2022
- |Rear-Admirals. ...and Rear-Admirals to be in the proportion of one Vice-Admiral to every two Rear-Admirals added to the list; should there be more than seven vacancies in any year th4 KB (694 words) - 16:57, 18 January 2022
- ==Rear-Admirals, Stornoway==2 KB (220 words) - 13:07, 5 April 2020
- ==Rear-Admirals of the United Kingdom==2 KB (262 words) - 15:36, 7 July 2020
- [[Category:Royal Navy Surgeon Rear-Admirals]]960 bytes (120 words) - 22:44, 6 April 2022
- [[Category:Royal Navy Paymaster Rear-Admirals]]960 bytes (114 words) - 16:21, 7 April 2022
- [[Category:Royal Navy Paymaster Rear-Admirals]]1 KB (156 words) - 16:46, 7 April 2022
- 4 members (0 subcategories, 0 files) - 00:46, 14 May 2016
File:Jerram and Brock, 1912.jpg French press photograph of Rear-Admirals [[Thomas Henry Martyn Jerram|T. H. Martyn Jerram]] and [[Frederic Edward Er(512 × 701 (37 KB)) - 07:49, 19 May 2013- 102 bytes (11 words) - 14:58, 23 April 2018
- 104 bytes (11 words) - 14:20, 9 May 2017
- 93 bytes (10 words) - 01:41, 16 January 2015