Search results
From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
- ...ander|name=Basil Ayton Austen|nick=Basil A. Austen|appt=18 February, 1901{{NLMar01|p. 241}}|end=4 May, 1901}}5 KB (683 words) - 17:17, 15 February 2022
- ...me=Francis Goodyere Dineley|nick=Francis G. Dineley|appt=7 December, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 248}}|end=31 December, 1901}}5 KB (682 words) - 14:58, 19 January 2020
- ...for a half-year in command of ''Mermaid'', commencing on 4 January, 1901.{{NLMar01|p. 281}} ...[H.M.S. Bittern (1897)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Bittern'']]'''<br>19 Apr, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 281}}<ref>Kerr Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/42.}} f. 253.</ref> &ndash11 KB (1,636 words) - 15:25, 7 April 2022
- ...aCRN}}|name=George Cecil Hardy|nick=George C. Hardy|appt=15 January, 1901{{NLMar01|p. 262}}|end=1 April, 1901}}5 KB (702 words) - 23:34, 30 October 2022
- ...=George Shadwell Quartano Carr|nick=George S. Q. Carr|appt=29 March, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 239}}|end=24 March, 1902|note=including [[Annual Manoeuvres of 1901]]?5 KB (636 words) - 12:22, 19 September 2022
- ...''|'''[[Ascension|Naval Officer in Charge, Ascension]]'''<br>30 May, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 439}} – 12 May, 1902|Succeeded by<br>'''[[Robert Kyle McAlpine|Rob5 KB (839 words) - 16:05, 7 April 2022
- ...awrence Hill Richardson|nick=Lawrence H. Richardson|appt=1 November, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 225}}|end=20 March, 1901|note=died while in command}}6 KB (800 words) - 15:42, 2 February 2022
- ...'''[[H.M.S. Hardy (1895)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Hardy'']]'''<br>28 Nov, 1900{{NLMar01|p. 262}} – 1901<ref>Carter Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/44/301.|D767 KB (1,069 words) - 22:24, 6 April 2022
- ...}|name=Mark Edward Frederic Kerr|nick=Mark E. F. Kerr|appt=19 April, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 281}}<ref>Kerr Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/42.}} f. 253.</ref>|end=256 KB (760 words) - 13:03, 13 April 2024
- ...additional to the {{UK-President|f=t}} temporarily on 14 September, 1900.{{NLMar01|p. 294}} From the ''President'' he went to supervise construction of the e7 KB (960 words) - 16:22, 7 April 2022
- ...ure|rank={{CaptRN}}|name=Henry Leah|nick=Henry Leah|appt=9 November, 1900{{NLMar01|p. 246}}|end=4 March, 1902|note=including [[Annual Manoeuvres of 1901]]?}}6 KB (828 words) - 22:15, 1 December 2021
- ...}}|name=Norman Hunter Carter|nick=Norman H. Carter|appt=28 November, 1900{{NLMar01|p. 262}}|end=1901<ref>Carter Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/44/301.|D7603086 KB (838 words) - 17:15, 30 May 2022
- ...name=Sydenham Gordon Douglas|nick=S. Gordon Douglas|appt=15 January, 1901{{NLMar01|p. 302''a''}}|end=1 December, 1901|note=including [[Annual Manoeuvres of 197 KB (848 words) - 12:57, 31 October 2022
- ...in Command|name=John William Renshaw|nick=John W. Renshaw|appt=early 1901{{NLMar01|p. 314}}|note=temporary, in command of {{UK-1Hunter}}}}6 KB (843 words) - 17:36, 14 February 2022
- ...ref>Long Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/43/259.|D7602591}} f. 285.</ref>{{NLMar01|p. 315-318}}|end=August, 1901<ref>Long Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/43/257 KB (867 words) - 14:27, 13 January 2021
- ...={{LaCRN}}|name=Henry Harvey Bruce|nick=Henry H. Bruce|appt=19 July, 1898{{NLMar01|p. 271}}|end=5 August, 1901<ref>Bruce Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/88.|D88 KB (1,073 words) - 12:20, 14 July 2021
- ...ajestic'', Blake transferred to the {{UK-Glory|f=t}} on 1 November, 1900.{{NLMar01|p. 259}}8 KB (1,179 words) - 22:17, 15 August 2022
- ...he was appointed to command the {{UK-Defiance|f=t}} on 1 November, 1900.{{NLMar01|p. 245}} Soon afterwards, he was promoted to the rank of {{CaptRN}} on 319 KB (1,301 words) - 23:10, 6 April 2022
- ....M.S. Arethusa (1882)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Arethusa'']]'''<br>14 Nov, 1899{{NLMar01|p. 225}}<ref>Startin Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/19.}} f. 331.</ref> &n11 KB (1,553 words) - 16:26, 7 April 2022
- ...[H.M.S. Halcyon (1894)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Halcyon'']]'''<br>15 Sep, 1900{{NLMar01|p. 261}} – 7 May, 1901<ref>Gough-Calthorpe Service Record. {{TNA|ADM13 KB (1,837 words) - 23:05, 6 April 2022