Search results
From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
- {{Com2RN}} [[Edmund Samuel Poë|Edmund S. Poë]] remained in command through this transition. In December 1904, it w ==Rear-Admirals and Commodores Commanding==2 KB (205 words) - 15:09, 2 April 2024
- ...all rank and command according to their seniority as Captains."<ref>''King's Regulations and Admiralty Instructions''. '''I'''. [''K.R. & A.I.''] p. ...Flag Officers and Commodores, provided there be no senior Captain present. Commodores shall take rank and command of each other according to their seniority as C3 KB (494 words) - 14:08, 8 January 2019
- ...es ranked and commanded after Rear-Admirals and above Captains.<ref>''King's Regulations and Admiralty Instructions'' (1913). '''I'''. [''K.R. & A.I.' <blockquote>A white broad pendant with the red St. George's Cross with a red ball in the upper canton of the broad pendant next the sta5 KB (859 words) - 15:20, 27 February 2024
- * {{UK-Endymion}} (S.O. of Squadron) * {{UK-Gibraltar}} (S.O. of Group)4 KB (442 words) - 13:11, 13 April 2021
- ==Commodores== {{Tenure|rank={{Com2RN}}|name=Louis Charles Stirling Woollcombe|nick=Louis C. S. Woollcombe|appt=7 June, 1921<ref>Woollcombe Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 1966 KB (722 words) - 19:42, 15 November 2021
- ...h to 27 destroyers whose modernity had been continuously refreshed. 5 L.C.S. would also be over twice as strong by this time, as well. 5 L.C.S. has gained a seaplane carrier, and 9 D.F. has gained a destroyer.{{SMNLNov7 KB (909 words) - 16:38, 4 May 2021
- ...ought Era and right up to 1997. It was based in [[H.M.S. Tamar (1863)|H.M.S. ''Tamar'']] before moving ashore. ==Commodores==10 KB (1,397 words) - 13:32, 29 November 2021
- by Your Majesty's Order in Council of the nineteenth importance to Your Majesty's Fleet.4 KB (643 words) - 14:13, 8 January 2019
- ...ermyn Landon|Arthur J. Landon]]'''|'''[[H.M.S. Ceres (1917)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Ceres'']]'''<br>17 Dec, 1928<ref>Wodehouse Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 19 ...Coleridge|Guy L. Coleridge]]'''|'''[[H.M.S. Calypso (1917)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Calypso'']]'''<br>Nov, 1929<ref>Wodehouse Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 1964 KB (565 words) - 16:52, 7 April 2022
- ==Commodores== {{Tenure|rank={{Com2RN}}|name=Cyril Samuel Townsend|nick=Cyril S. Townsend|appt=17 August, 1922<ref>Townsend Service Record. {{TNA|ADM 196/12 KB (1,819 words) - 20:44, 21 April 2022
- ...and retirement now authorised and granted to the officers of Your Majesty's Naval and Military forces, of ascertaining the comparative situation of the And whereas the said Commissioners have, in obedience to Your Majesty's commands, made a report to your Majesty on the points referred to them, inc10 KB (1,757 words) - 16:38, 18 January 2022
- ...ted on the commission was '''Admiral and Commander in Chief of His Majesty's Fleet''' (or Her Majesty during the reign of a female monarch).<ref>See com ...d special war or other conspicuous service since the attainment of captain's rank."<ref>''Hansard'': [http://hansard.millbanksystems.com/commons/1916/au5 KB (866 words) - 13:08, 27 February 2024
- Lambert entered the training ship [[H.M.S. Britannia (Training Ship)|''Britannia'']] on 15 July, 1877. ...Alexander Plantagenet Hastings]] of {{UK-1Euryalus}} reported that Lambert's conduct was "everything that could be wished."<ref>Lambert Service Record.13 KB (1,867 words) - 17:57, 24 December 2022
- [[Admiral (Royal Navy)|Admiral]] '''John Denison''', D.S.O., Royal Navy (25 May, 1853 – 9 March, 1939) was an officer of the [ He was appointed a Companion of the Distinguished Service Order (D.S.O.) on 4 June, 1917.{{GazSup|30111|5462|4 June, 1917}}6 KB (824 words) - 22:42, 6 April 2022
- On the occasion of King George V's coronation he was appointed an Additional Member of the Third Class, or Com ...In recognition of his services during the war, on the occasion of the King's birthday Purey-Cust was appointed a Knight Commander of the Military Divisi5 KB (725 words) - 16:08, 7 April 2022
- {{ViceRN}} '''Patrick Edward Parker''', D.S.O., Royal Navy, Retired (17 March, 1881 – 19 August, 1941) was an off ...sioning on 4 November. He then took the second part of the Senior Officer's Technical Course and a course in Mining before being appointed a second tim5 KB (788 words) - 09:17, 13 March 2024
- ...890) and Lucy Ann Moss. He entered [[H.M.S. Britannia (Training Ship)|H.M.S. ''Britannia'']] in 1895. He first went to sea on the [[battleship]] {{UK- ...r, Reyne was appointed to [[H.M.S. Cambridge (Gunnery Training School)|H.M.S. ''Cambridge'']] for Junior Staff (G) duties on 8 May and instructed to tak8 KB (1,168 words) - 13:05, 9 June 2022
- ...st, 1918.{{Gaz|30881|1039|3 September, 1918}} On the occasion of the King's birthday Shortland was appointed an Ordinary Member of the Third Class, or ...-Hall|George F. King-Hall]]'''|'''[[H.M.S. Narcissus (1886)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Narcissus'']]'''<br>21 May, 1901{{NLMay03|p. 283}} – 10 Jun, 1901<5 KB (689 words) - 16:21, 7 April 2022
- ...ember, 1900, Cayley was appointed First Lieutenant of the battleship [[H.M.S. Benbow (1885)|''Benbow'']].<ref>"Naval & Military Intelligence" (Official ...inted to Rear-Admiral [[Spencer Henry Metcalfe Login|Spencer H. M. Login]]'s Committee on Clothing, followed by an appointment to a Signal Course on 109 KB (1,253 words) - 22:25, 6 April 2022
- He was appointed command of the battleship [[H.M.S. Cornwallis (1901)|''Cornwallis'']] on 14 January, 1905.<ref>"Naval and Mil ...f>ADM 196/38. f. 242.</ref> On 12 July, on the occasion of King George V's visit to Dublin, Coke was appointed a Knight Commander of the Royal Victori7 KB (1,031 words) - 22:30, 6 April 2022